Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Leave - Deployment of Family Members in the Armed Forces
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified employees to take leave from work on the day that an immediate family member is leaving for, or returning from, active duty outside the United States as a member of the armed forces of the United States; prohibiting an employer from requiring an employee to use compensatory, sick, or vacation leave when taking leave under the Act; authorizing an employer to require an employee who takes leave under the Act to submit specified proof to the employer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1028 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/26/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {967174/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/26/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {967174/1 Report Adopted 13
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 15
House 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 17
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM