Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – School Supplies for Home Instruction and Virtual Learning Programs
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Corderman, Eckardt, Ready, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to $250 of expenses paid or incurred by a parent or guardian of a student in kindergarten through grade 12 during the 2021 taxable year for certain school supplies used by certain students participating in a home instruction program or virtual learning program conducted in response to the COVID-19 public health emergency; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/01/2020
Legislative Date
10/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/01/2020 10/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – School Supplies for Home Instruction and Virtual Learning Programs
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:48 PM
Click to return on the top page