Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making it a misdemeanor to knowingly and willfully shine, point, or focus the beam of a laser pointer on an individual operating an aircraft; exempting specified individuals under specified circumstances from provisions of the Act; and specifying a penalty.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0012
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/24/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {648273/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 10/24/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {648273/1 Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Judiciary 33
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM