Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Alterations
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering eligibility for the Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program by altering the definition of "qualified Maryland biotechnology company"; stating that the purpose of the program is to foster the growth of Maryland's biotechnology industry; altering the maximum percentage, from 15% to 10%, of the Maryland Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit Reserve Fund that a qualified Maryland biotechnology company may receive in a fiscal year; applying the Act to initial credit certificates issued after June 30, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/22/2020
Legislative Date
10/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {699830/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/22/2020 10/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic Development – Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Alterations
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {699830/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development – Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program – Alterations
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Referred Ways and Means 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page