Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the fourth Thursday in March as Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day through appropriate and informative programs and activities.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0716
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/19/2019
Legislative Date
9/19/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/19/2019 9/19/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 1:38 PM