Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey and Norman
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying to Cecil County and Queen Anne's County specified provisions authorizing the governing body of a county to contract with another governmental entity for the joint or cooperative performance of any governmental function; authorizing the governing body of a county to accept specified gifts or grants from the federal or State government and to use the gifts and grants for specified purposes; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0187
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2015
Legislative Date
1/16/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/15/2015 1/16/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 32
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 36
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM