Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to recover unemployment insurance benefits by assessment in the same manner as provided in a specified provision of law for the assessment of past due contributions; and requiring the Secretary, if the Secretary seeks to recover specified unemployment benefits by assessment, to allow a claimant to elect, within 30 days of the date of the notice of assessment, to have the amount collected by suit instead of by assessment.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0137
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/03/2016
Legislative Date
10/03/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {847875/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/03/2016 10/03/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {847875/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Economic Matters 36
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text - Chapter - Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-629, 8-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM