Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc.
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to issue a sports and event wagering license to the Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc. if the Commission issues a license to another entity.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0897
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:48 PM
Click to return on the top page