Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Cassilly, Norman, and Ready
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to apply for preliminary approval of a handgun permit without completing a certified firearms training course; requiring the Secretary of State Police to investigate an application for a handgun permit; requiring the Secretary to issue preliminary approval for a handgun permit if the applicant meets certain requirements except the certified firearms training course; requiring an applicant to satisfy a certain firearm training requirement within 120 days after receipt of preliminary approval; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0029
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/30/2017
Legislative Date
8/30/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568474/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate P. Young) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/30/2017 8/30/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {568474/1 Adopted 13
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13
Text - Third - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 15
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Referred Judiciary 16
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Adopted 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate P. Young) Adopted 53
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 57
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM