Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Hershey, Hester, Carozza, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who is at least 13 years old, a corporation, a partnership, an association, a nonprofit entity, the State, or any unit or political subdivision of the State from knowingly and intentionally releasing or causing to be released, or organizing the release of, a balloon into the atmosphere, with certain exceptions; requiring a certain unit, officer, or official of a local government with delegated enforcement authority to report certain violations; establishing a civil penalty of $250 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0013
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/14/2019
Legislative Date
7/14/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984332/1
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {653325/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted (36-10)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
26
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/14/2019 7/14/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {984332/1 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Hough) Adopted 20
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Favorable 21
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 21
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 22
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Floor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings) 22
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 22
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Floor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn 23
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Floor Amendment {653325/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted (36-10) 23
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Text - Third - Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 25
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 26
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2301 )
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 9:50 AM