Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Hershey, Hester, Carozza, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who is at least 13 years old, a corporation, a partnership, an association, a nonprofit entity, the State, or any unit or political subdivision of the State from knowingly and intentionally releasing or causing to be released, or organizing the release of, a balloon into the atmosphere, with certain exceptions; requiring a certain unit, officer, or official of a local government with delegated enforcement authority to report certain violations; establishing a civil penalty of $250 for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0013
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/14/2019
Legislative Date
7/14/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984332/1
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {653325/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted (36-10)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/14/2019 7/14/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {984332/1 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Hough) Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Favorable 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Floor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Floor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Floor Amendment {653325/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted (36-10) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 26 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-2301 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page