Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Websites - Language Access
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each State department, agency, and program to provide equal access versions of certain websites in certain languages except under certain circumstances; repealing a certain provision of law providing that the reasonable steps certain departments, agencies, and programs are required to take related to equal access to public services for individuals with limited English proficiency include the operation and maintenance of certain equal access versions of certain websites; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/03/2017
Legislative Date
10/03/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Websites - Language Access
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Websites - Language Access
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-17)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Government - Websites - Language Access
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/03/2017 10/03/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Websites - Language Access
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - State Government - Websites - Language Access
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (119-17) 61A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733
Text - Chapter - State Government - Websites - Language Access
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1102, 10-1103, 10-1104, 10-1105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM