Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the House - Third Reading Failed (41-89)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a health care provider who attests in a certificate of a qualified expert or who testifies in relation to a proceeding before an arbitration panel or a court concerning compliance with or departure from standards of care devote no more than 20% of the provider's professional activities to activities that directly involve testimony in personal injury claims.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1581
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1037 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/10/2017
Legislative Date
10/10/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-16)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {992712/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Delegate Lam) Rejected (56-83)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-52)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Ramirez)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Ramirez)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Cluster and Sanchez)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Cluster and Sanchez)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Motion Limit Debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (30-16)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {853329/1 Adopted (24-21)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (24-21)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {853329/1
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Hill) Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {853329/1
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Failed (41-89)
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/10/2017 10/10/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (29-16) 43
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judiciary 43A
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments {992712/1 Adopted 53
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Delegate Lam) Rejected (56-83) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (84-52) 54
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Ramirez) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Smith and Ramirez) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Refuses Recede 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Cluster and Sanchez) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Refuses Recede 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, Cluster and Sanchez) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Motion Limit Debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (30-16) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Conference Committee Report {853329/1 Adopted (24-21) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (24-21) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Conference Committee Report {853329/1 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Hill) Adopted 69
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Conference Committee Report {853329/1 70
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 70
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Conference Committee Report Adopted 70
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Failed (41-89) 70
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM