Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Physicians to license genetic counselors; providing that provisions of the Act do not limit the right of certain individuals to practice certain occupations; establishing the Genetic Counseling Advisory Committee within the Board; requiring individuals, on or after January 1, 2024, to be licensed by the Board as genetic counselors before practicing genetic counseling in the State; requiring the Board to issue a supervised genetic counselor license to certain applicants on or after January 1, 2024; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0299
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/09/2020
Legislative Date
7/09/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164238/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/09/2020 7/09/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {164238/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 16 Click to view Recorded Media
(   14-5G-01 through 14-5G-29 )
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page