Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Life Imprisonment
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 15 years to 25 years, the amount of time that an inmate who has been sentenced to life imprisonment after being convicted of a crime committed on or after October 1, 2020, must serve before becoming eligible for parole consideration.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0150 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/12/2019
Legislative Date
8/12/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Life Imprisonment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/12/2019 8/12/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Life Imprisonment
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 9:51 AM