Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Credits - Electronic Filing Requirements - Waiver
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Comptroller, under specified circumstances, to grant a waiver from the requirement that a taxpayer claiming specified tax credits submit a claim for the credit by electronic means; and applying the Act to tax years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/28/2016
Legislative Date
7/28/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Credits - Electronic Filing Requirements - Waiver
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Credits - Electronic Filing Requirements - Waiver
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {295663/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Tax Credits - Electronic Filing Requirements - Waiver
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Tax Credits - Electronic Filing Requirements - Waiver
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/28/2016 7/28/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tax Credits - Electronic Filing Requirements - Waiver
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Favorable Adopted 25
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Tax Credits - Electronic Filing Requirements - Waiver
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 27
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Referred Ways and Means 30
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {295663/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Tax Credits - Electronic Filing Requirements - Waiver
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Text - Chapter - Tax Credits - Electronic Filing Requirements - Waiver
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM