Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - State Designations - Great Seal
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire and Kagan
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a specified statutory translation of the Calvert family motto depicted on the Great Seal of the State; establishing a specified meaning for the Calvert family motto, "Fatti maschii parole femine", which generally means "Strong deeds, gentle words".
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/10/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154638/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154638/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (31-13)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {154638/2 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 8/10/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {154638/1 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {154638/1 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (31-13) 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Floor Committee Amendment (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {154638/2 Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 50
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page