Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations
Sponsored by
Senators Norman and Cassilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that any payment toward, written or oral affirmation of, or any other activity on a certain debt that occurs after the expiration of the statute of limitations applicable to the consumer debt collection action does not revive or extend the limitations period; and providing that a certain provision of law may not be interpreted to affect the statute of limitations applicable to a cause of action arising from a certain agreement or payment plan entered into before the expiration of a certain statute of limitations.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/02/2017
Legislative Date
11/02/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {518773/1
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {518773/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/02/2017 11/02/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {518773/1 26
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 26
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {518773/1 Adopted 27
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Text - Third - Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Referred Judiciary 30
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Text - Chapter - Courts - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Statute of Limitations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM