Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City – Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department – Residency Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (125-11)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore to require members of the command staff of the Police Department of Baltimore City, at the rank of captain or above, to reside in Baltimore City; and providing that a certain local law, ordinance, or policy enacted or adopted by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore shall apply prospectively.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/13/2018
Legislative Date
11/13/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2019
Legislative Date
1/15/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {658671/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {970516/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Branch) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-11)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/13/2018 11/13/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Baltimore City - At-Will Supervisory Members of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
Senate 1/15/2019 1/15/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {658671/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Baltimore City – Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department – Residency Requirements
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53A
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {970516/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Branch) Adopted 66
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (125-11) 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-1, 16-2A )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM