Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth and Hettleman
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from engaging in certain sexual acts, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a victim, witness, or suspect in an open investigation that the officer is conducting, supervising, or assisting with if the officer knew or should have known that the person is a victim, witness, or suspect, is requesting assistance from or responding to the law enforcement officer in the course of the officer's official duties, or is in the custody of the officer; establishing a certain exception; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0411
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/29/2020
Legislative Date
9/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {358575/1 Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/29/2020 9/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments {358575/1 Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Referred Judiciary 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 11:24 AM
Click to return on the top page