Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Benefit Corporations and Benefit Limited Liability Companies
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on property owned or leased by a benefit corporation or benefit limited liability company, property that is not used for residential purposes, and property used in a trade or business by a benefit corporation or benefit limited liability company; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0272
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0483 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/22/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-12)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/22/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (126-12) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM