Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the food supplement program in the Department of Human Services to be the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program; providing that the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program is the successor of the food supplement program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
5
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
6
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 3
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 3
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 5
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Referred Appropriations 6
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 1:00 PM