Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey and Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland to act as a property manager of the Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0639
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/20/2020
Legislative Date
8/20/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {887476/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
22AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/20/2020 8/20/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
Senate 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {887476/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 2/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 22AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 7:21 PM
Click to return on the top page