Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland to act as a property manager of the Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0639
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/20/2020
Legislative Date
8/20/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/20/2020 8/20/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Property Management - Southern Maryland Regional Agricultural Center
Senate 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 4:45 PM
Click to return on the top page