Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Strategic Energy Investment Program - Reporting
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Energy Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain planning and reporting requirements for the Strategic Energy Investment Program; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration, by December 31, 2019, to develop a plan for expenditures for fiscal year 2020 and a plan for expenditures covering the next 3 fiscal years; requiring an annual report to be provided to the Strategic Energy Investment Advisory Board and to include information on program initiatives, the status of programs and expenditures, and possible or expected future changes; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/02/2018
Legislative Date
10/02/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Strategic Energy Investment Program - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {133429/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Strategic Energy Investment Program - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Government - Strategic Energy Investment Program - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/02/2018 10/02/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Government - Strategic Energy Investment Program - Reporting
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Floor Amendment {133429/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Strategic Energy Investment Program - Reporting
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Economic Matters 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Text - Chapter - State Government - Strategic Energy Investment Program - Reporting
(   9-20B-01, 9-20B-06, 9-20B-12 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page