Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the General Assembly may authorize, by law, the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to issue certain sports wagering licenses; providing that a license may be issued only to the holder of a video lottery operation license or a license for thoroughbred racing or harness racing; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that State revenues generated by the proposed sports wagering be used for dedicated purposes including public education; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0470 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/20/2019
Legislative Date
9/20/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/20/2019 9/20/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM