Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the local boards of elections to require that a majority of the members of the boards be registered members of the political party with the largest number of registered voters in the county, rather than being of the majority party, and the remainder of the members of the boards be registered members of the political party with the second largest number of registered voters in the county, rather than being of the principal minority party.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Membership
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page