Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to adopt regulations that authorize a tidal fish licensee authorized to catch crabs using all legal gear to work 1 additional early hour on Labor Day, Memorial Day, July 4, and the day before each of these holidays in a license year.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/03/2016
Legislative Date
10/03/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crabs - Harvest Times - Trotlines and Crab Pots
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714430/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {500416/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/03/2016 10/03/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Crabs - Harvest Times - Trotlines and Crab Pots
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {714430/1 Adopted 33
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Text - Third - Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {500416/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Text - Chapter - Crabs - Harvest Times - Holidays
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM