Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering in Dorchester County the hours that a Class B beer and light wine license holder may sell beer and light wine on Sundays for on- and off-premises consumption; and repealing a prohibition against the sale of beer and light wine on Sundays after a specified time for off-premises consumption.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0167
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/21/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/21/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 17
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Second Reading Passed 17
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 21
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM