Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing references to the "Chesapeake 2000 Agreement" in specified provisions of law relating to forest lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund and substituting references to the "2014 Chesapeake Bay Watershed Agreement"; requiring that the Trust Fund be utilized to support State and local watershed implementation plans by targeting limited financial resources on the most effective nonpoint source pollution control projects and to improve the health of Atlantic Coastal Bays and tributaries; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/10/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464532/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 8/10/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {464532/1 Report Adopted 15
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 17
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 18
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-102, 8-2A-01, 8-2A-02, 8-2A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM