Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0061


CH0605

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and Reilly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring telephone companies and commercial mobile radio service (CMRS) providers to keep records of 9-1-1 fees collected and remitted for at least 4 years after the fees are remitted; requiring the Comptroller, in consultation with the Emergency Number Systems Board, to adopt procedures for auditing surcharge collection and remittance by telephones companies and CMRS providers; providing the Comptroller is entitled to .5% of the fees to cover the expense of conducting audits; authorizing the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0006
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2019
Legislative Date
10/28/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {119534/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/28/2019 10/28/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable with Amendments {119534/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 33
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 34
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 49B
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:31 PM