Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Solvency – Study
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Uninsured Employers' Fund)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Director of the Uninsured Employers' Fund to report, by October 1, 2019, to the Senate Finance Committee, the House Economic Matters Committee, and the Joint Committee on Workers' Compensation Benefit and Insurance Oversight on the solvency of the Fund and whether the General Assembly should adjust or provide authority to adjust a certain assessment; requiring the report to include a discussion of certain payments for compensation to claimants, prospective liabilities, and certain hearing loss claims; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/26/2018
Legislative Date
10/26/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {607070/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483499/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Solvency – Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Solvency – Study
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/26/2018 10/26/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Uninsured Employers' Fund - Suspension and Resumption of Assessments - Repeal
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {607070/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Solvency and Suspension and Resumption of Assessments – Study
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Economic Matters 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {483499/1 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Solvency – Study
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Text - Chapter - Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Solvency – Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM