Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain employees working at a heightened security interest location be paid a certain wage or combination of wages and benefits; declaring findings of the General Assembly; specifying that certain provisions of the Act do not diminish certain rights of certain covered employees; specifying that a certain agreement to work for less than a certain wage is void under certain circumstances; requiring an employer to keep certain records for at least 3 years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1410
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0794 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-103, 3-1501 through 3-1511, 3-403 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:48 PM