Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Professional Corporations - Approval of Corporate Name by Licensing Unit and Professional Organization - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting professional corporations in which a majority of the stockholders are individuals who are licensed, certified, or otherwise authorized to practice a health occupation under the Health Occupations Article from the requirement that the name of a professional corporation must be approved by the appropriate licensing unit and professional organization; providing that the exemption does not apply to a professional corporation that provides dental services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/21/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {208574/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803893/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 9/21/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {208574/1 Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 33
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {803893/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM