Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems)
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a paramedic to administer a vaccination included on the Recommended Adult Immunization Schedule from the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention if the services are under the direction of a certain entity or a certain physician and authorized by the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems, part of a certain program or outreach effort, and provided in accordance with a certain written agreement that includes certain provisions.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 6:08 PM