Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems) and Senators Carozza, Gallion, Hester, Kagan, and Reilly
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a paramedic to administer a vaccination included on the Recommended Adult Immunization Schedule from the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention or authorized for emergency use by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration if the services are under the direction of an EMS operational program medical director, ambulance service medical director, or other qualified physician, authorized by the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems, and part of a certain program or population heath outreach effort; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1313
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {913920/1 Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:35 PM
Click to return on the top page