Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 120 to 240, the minimum number of calendar days that the Correctional Education Council must require certain inmates in correctional institutions to participate in a certain mandatory education program.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/17/2019
Legislative Date
9/17/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary Ways and Means
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 5:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/17/2019 9/17/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Referred Judiciary Ways and Means 24
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 5:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 4:31 PM