Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Superintendents of Schools - Reappointment Exemption in Washington County and Recruitment Recommendations
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Montgomery, and Serafini
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting the Washington County Board of Education from specified requirements for appointment and reappointment of a Washington County Superintendent of Schools; requiring the State Superintendent of Schools, on or before November 1, 2015, to submit recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly on ways to improve the recruitment and retention of county superintendents of schools in the State; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0191
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164931/1
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164931/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {703720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {164931/1 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 27
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments {164931/1 Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {703720/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 32
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM