Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness; specifying the membership of the Commission; providing for the appointment of a Senate cochair and House cochair of the Commission; providing for the staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving compensation but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study, consider, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring a report on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0221
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0625 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM