Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the exemptions from length and overhang limits for vehicles carrying piling, poles, or mill logs; establishing length and overhang limits at which a hauling permit from the State Highway Administration would be required for vehicles carrying piling, poles, or mill logs; repealing the requirement that piling, poles, mill logs, and similar cargo be transported while enclosed within the sides or ends of the vehicle; altering the fastening standards for transporting piling, poles, mill logs, and other similar cargo; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {918670/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
10
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-9)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {918670/1 Report Adopted 8A
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8A
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 10
House 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 12
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (127-9) 64
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-101, 24-104.1, 24-105, 24-106.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM