Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Police Officers – Mental Health – Employee Assistance Programs
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each law enforcement agency to provide confidential access to an employee assistance program or a mental health program to address the mental health issues of police officers stemming from personal and work-related concerns, including stress, financial issues, legal issues, and family problems; requiring each agency provide all its officers with a voluntary mental health consultation or counseling following certain incidents; requiring an agency to provide access to services at minimal cost to the officer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0088
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0565 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Police Officers – Mental Health – Employee Assistance Programs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Police Officers – Mental Health – Employee Assistance Programs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/21/2021 3:09 PM