Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; altering the amount of the credit from a one-time $500 credit to a maximum of $250 for taxable years beginning January 1, 2019, and January 1, 2020, and a maximum of $500 for the taxable year beginning January 1, 2021, and for each taxable year thereafter; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0432 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/18/2017
Legislative Date
10/18/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/18/2017 10/18/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-718 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM