Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Sponsored by
Senator Griffith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to give preference to applications for funding for a net-zero home from the Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Fund that will use the services of small, minority, women-owned, and veteran-owned businesses in the clean energy industry, particularly those businesses that provide employment for individuals trained through workforce development programs supported by the Strategic Energy Investment Fund and the Clean Energy Workforce Account.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0070
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-23)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (113-23) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text - Chapter - Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:27 PM
Click to return on the top page