Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the jurisdiction of the orphans' courts and circuit courts over certain guardians of the person and guardians of the property; altering the circumstances under which a guardian of the property of a person with a physical or mental disability, a guardian of the property of a person with certain other conditions, and a guardian of the property of a minor shall be appointed; establishing certain procedures for the appointment of certain guardians of the property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/03/2018
Legislative Date
8/03/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/03/2018 8/03/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Protection of Minors and Disabled Persons - Guardianship
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 13-105, 13-201, 13-201.1, 13-201.2, 13-201.3, 13-203, 13-210, 13-211, 13-212, 13-218, 13-223, 13-704, 13-705, 13-708.1, 13-709, 13-801, 13-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM