Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Ethics Commission)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a regulated lobbyist to file a registration and certain reports electronically with the State Ethics Commission; altering the manner in which a lobbyist is required to file a certain report with the Department of Legislative Services; repealing a requirement that the Department of Legislative Services forward a certain report to the State Ethics Commission; and altering a requirement that the State Ethics Commission develop certain procedures regarding electronic filing of certain reports filed by regulated lobbyists.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/02/2018
Legislative Date
10/02/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2019
Legislative Date
1/07/2019
Action
Hearing 1/10 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
4
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
7
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2019
Legislative Date
1/18/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
8
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/02/2018 10/02/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/07/2019 1/07/2019 Hearing 1/10 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 Favorable Adopted 4
Senate 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 Second Reading Passed 4
Text - Third - Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing
Senate 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 7
House 1/18/2019 1/18/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 8
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Text - Chapter - Public Ethics - Lobbyist Registration and Reporting - Mandatory Electronic Filing
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-704, 5-705, 5-706, 5-707, 5-708, 5-709, 5-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM