Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Miller, and West
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain museums located in the State to claim title to property that is on permanent loan or that was loaned for a certain term that has expired by giving notice that the museum is terminating the loan of the property; authorizing a museum to take possession of certain property if the lender fails to respond to a notice provided by certified mail within 60 days; authorizing a museum to acquire a certain lien for the costs of certain conservation measures taken on the property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0021
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0255 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2019
Legislative Date
10/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {718875/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
13
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2019 10/15/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments {718875/1 Adopted 10
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10
Text - Third - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Referred Economic Matters 13
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-801, 16-802, 17-401 through 17-408 )
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 10:23 AM