Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a correctional facility to provide an inmate who has completed a sentence of imprisonment for a felony conviction with a voter registration form before releasing the inmate; requiring a correctional facility to inform the inmate that the inmate will have the right to vote after the inmate's release from the correctional facility, and the inmate must register to vote after the inmate's release to exercise the right to vote; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0051
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/23/2019
Legislative Date
8/23/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/23/2019 8/23/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 10:23 AM