Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the holder of a nonresident insurance producer license to maintain a current license as a resident insurance producer in good standing in the holder's home state; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to cancel a nonresident producer license after receiving notification that the producer no longer has a home state license; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Favorable Adopted 10
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Second Reading Passed 10
Text - Third - Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/21/2020 12:54 PM