Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements under certain circumstances for golf carts on Upper or Middle Hoopers Island or Taylors Island in Dorchester County; providing that a person who operates a golf cart on a highway on Upper or Middle Hoopers Island or Taylors Island may operate the golf cart only on highways on which the maximum speed does not exceed 30 miles per hour between dawn and dusk and only if the golf cart is equipped with certain lighting devices; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0023
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/16/2019
Legislative Date
10/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {448471/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
18
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/16/2019 10/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {448471/1 Adopted 15
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 10:24 AM