Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain investor-owned gas, electric, or combination gas and electric companies to require certain contractors and subcontractors to pay their employees not less than the prevailing wage rate for certain projects involving the construction, reconstruction, installation, demolition, restoration, or alteration of any underground gas or electric infrastructure of the company, and any related traffic control activities.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0174
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1011 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2020
Legislative Date
10/05/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-42)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2021
Legislative Date
5/28/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2020 10/05/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Investor-Owned Utilities - Prevailing Wage
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Economic Matters 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-42) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/28/2021 5/28/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page